Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aliaksandr Yasheuski, S.D.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Minsk-Mohilev

Titular Bishop of Furnos Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1974 BornSmarhon
22 Aug 199218.0ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Aug 199823.9Solemn ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Jun 199924.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jun 200025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Jun 201540.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
9 Jun 201540.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
27 Jun 201540.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior

MicroData Summary for Aliaksandr Yasheuski:
Bishop Aliaksandr Yasheuski S.D.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Minsk-Mohilev

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2015
  • od/ob/prof/c01: CB, 9 Jun 2015
  • c2: CB, 10 Jun 2015
  • c34: CB, 17 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,510

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015