Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tadeusz Kondrusiewicz

Archbishop of Minsk-Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1946 BornOdelsk
31 May 198135.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 198943.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Minsk, Belarus
10 May 198943.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
20 Oct 198943.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
13 Apr 199145.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of European Russia {Russia Europea}
11 Feb 200256.1AppointedArchbishop of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow), Russian Federation
21 Sep 200761.7AppointedArchbishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
10 Nov 200761.9InstalledArchbishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
30 Jun 201165.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pinsk, Belarus
16 Jun 201266.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Pinsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Kondrusiewicz:
Archbishop Tadeusz Kondrusiewicz (born ) Archbishop of Minsk-Mohilev

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 13 Jan 2014