Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemens Pickel

Bishop of San Clemente a Saratov


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1961 BornColditz
19 Dec 198726.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany
25 Jun 198826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany
23 Mar 199836.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of European Russia {Russia Europea}
23 Mar 199836.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Chusira
7 Jun 199836.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chusira
23 Nov 199938.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Southern European Russia {Russia Europea Meridionale}
11 Feb 200240.5AppointedBishop of San Clemente a Saratov, Russian Federation

MicroData Summary for Clemens Pickel:
Bishop Clemens Pickel (born ) Bishop of San Clemente a Saratov

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Clemente a Saratov.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013