Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Weinhold

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen)

Titular Bishop of Idicra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1934BornZittau
19 Dec 195925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
4 Jul 197338.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
4 Jul 197338.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Idicra
8 Sep 197338.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Idicra
22 Aug 200873.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany
10 Oct 201378.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Weinhold:
Bishop Georg Weinhold (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen)

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Aug 2008
  • d: CB, 11 Oct 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 28 Feb 2014