Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto Spülbeck, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1904BornAachen
5 Apr 193026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
28 Jun 195551.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
28 Jun 195551.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
25 Jul 195551.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
20 Jun 195854.4AppointedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
24 Jul 195854.5InstalledBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
21 Jun 197066.5DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Otto Spülbeck:
Bishop Otto Spülbeck C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 59
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 11 Oct 2013