Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand de Piontek

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Görlitz

Titular Bishop of Barca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1878BornLeobschütz
20 Jul 190324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
16 May 195980.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Görlitz, Germany
16 May 195980.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
24 Jun 195980.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
2 Nov 196385.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Görlitz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand de Piontek:
Bishop Ferdinand de Piontek (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Görlitz

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013