Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenz Cardinal Jäger (Jaeger)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paderborn

Cardinal-Priest of San Leone I


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1892BornHalle an der Saale
1 Apr 192229.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
29 May 194148.6SelectedArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany
10 Aug 194148.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Oct 194149.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany
22 Feb 196572.4Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196572.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Leone I
30 Jun 197380.7RetiredArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany
1 Apr 197582.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Lorenz Jäger (Jaeger):
Lorenz Cardinal Jäger (Jaeger) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paderborn

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 17 Jul 2015