Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascàsio Rettler, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1915Born
29 Nov 194227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Jul 196853.4AppointedBishop of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil
12 Sep 196853.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil
1 Dec 198974.8RetiredBishop of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil
16 Sep 200489.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pascàsio Rettler
Bishop Pascàsio Rettler O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bacabal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastrop-Rauxel (Merklinde), Germany
Ordained BishopChurch, Castrop-Rauxel (Merklinde)

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast