Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacinto Furtado de Brito Sobrinho

Archbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1947 Born
15 Jan 197224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil
18 Feb 199850.6AppointedBishop of Crateús, Ceara, Brazil
24 May 199850.9Ordained BishopBishop of Crateús, Ceara, Brazil
22 Feb 201264.6AppointedArchbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Furtado de Brito Sobrinho
Archbishop Jacinto Furtado de Brito Sobrinho (born ) Archbishop of Teresina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBacabal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Teresina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,328
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018