Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Maria Janssen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1907Born
29 Jul 193426.5Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
3 Feb 195749.0AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
14 May 195749.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
28 Dec 198376.0RetiredBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
7 Oct 198880.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Maria Janssen
Bishop Heinrich Maria Janssen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRindern

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast