Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolf Kindermann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Titular Bishop of Utimmira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1899Born
5 Apr 192424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
11 Jul 196666.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
11 Jul 196666.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Utimmira
8 Sep 196667.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utimmira
23 Oct 197475.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adolf Kindermann
Bishop Adolf Kindermann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeugrafenwalde

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018