Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Kempf

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Limburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1906BornWiesbaden
8 Dec 193226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
3 May 194942.7SelectedBishop of Limburg, Germany
28 May 194942.8ConfirmedBishop of Limburg, Germany
25 Jul 194943.0Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
10 Aug 198175.0RetiredBishop of Limburg, Germany
9 Oct 198276.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Kempf:
Bishop Wilhelm Kempf (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Limburg

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1949, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014