Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Gunther Kampe

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Limburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Bassiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1909Born
8 Dec 193425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
20 Jul 195243.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Limburg, Germany
20 Jul 195243.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bassiana
7 Sep 195243.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bassiana
30 May 198474.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Limburg, Germany
22 Apr 199888.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Walter Gunther Kampe
Bishop Walter Gunther Kampe (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Limburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWiesbaden

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018