Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Fargo

Dioecesis Fargensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Thomas Folda, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 6 April 1897
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: North Dakota
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 92,650 (35,786 Square Miles)
  • Description: Cass, Richland, Sargent, Ransom, Dickey, La Moure, Barnes, McIntosh, Logan, Kidder, Stutsman, Sheridan, Wells, Foster, Griggs, Steele, Traill, Grand Forks, Nelson, Eddy, Benson, Pierce, Rolette, Towner, Ramsey, McHenry, Bottineau, Cavalier, Walsh, and Pembina Counties.
  • Conference Region: VIII (MN, ND, SD)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: FAR
  • Official Web Site: http://www.fargodiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 5201 Bishops Blvd., Suite A, Fargo, ND 58104
  • Telephone: (701)356-7900
  • Fax: 356-7999

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Jamestown
10 November 1889ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Dakota Diocese of Jamestown (erected)
Diocese of Fargo
6 April 1897Name ChangedDiocese of Jamestown Diocese of Fargo
31 December 1909Territory LostDiocese of Fargo Diocese of Bismarck (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Fargo
195075,734408,87318.5%145221674534368185ap1951
1966100,168386,74825.9%16725192521480182ap1967
1970103,345386,74826.7%1402116164126568118ap1971
197697,727372,98326.2%1243015463439430119ap1977
1980101,111387,00026.1%120261466921131345116ap1981
1990101,823398,52025.6%104241287953126262117ap1991
199998,915391,00025.3%1539162610328153159ap2000
200098,915391,00025.3%112101228103227196159ap2001
200198,960391,00025.3%110101208243222153159ap2002
200299,868391,00025.5%12891377282613206156ap2003
200387,730374,96923.4%1229131669319213158ap2004
200484,190374,25622.5%1287135623407203158ap2005
200682,891379,82121.8%11891276524210160138ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 30 Jun 2013