Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Ferdinand Dworschak

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fargo, North Dakota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1900BornIndependence, WI
29 May 192626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
22 Jun 194646.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
22 Jun 194646.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
22 Aug 194646.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium
10 Apr 194747.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
23 Feb 196059.8AppointedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
10 May 196060.0InstalledBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
8 Sep 197070.4ResignedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
8 Sep 197070.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Meta
13 Jan 197170.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Meta
5 Nov 197676.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Fargo, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Ferdinand Dworschak:
Bishop Leo Ferdinand Dworschak (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fargo

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015