Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justin Albert Driscoll

Deceased

Bishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1920Born
28 Jul 194524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
8 Sep 197049.9AppointedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
28 Oct 197050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
19 Nov 198464.1DiedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Justin Albert Driscoll
Bishop Justin Albert Driscoll (born , died ) Bishop of Fargo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDubuque, IA, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa
Ordained BishopSainte-Marie, Cathedral, Fargo, Diocese of Fargo, North Dakota

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 687
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 19 Dec 2019

Quantcast