Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Dubuque

Archidioecesis Dubuquensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michael Owen Jackels, Archbishop
  • Jerome George Hanus, O.S.B., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Daniel William Kucera, O.S.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Dubuque
28 July 1837ErectedDiocese of Saint Louis Diocese of Dubuque (erected)
19 July 1850Territory LostDiocese of Dubuque
Diocese of Milwaukee
Diocese of Saint Paul (erected)
14 June 1881Territory LostDiocese of Dubuque Diocese of Davenport (erected)
Archdiocese of Dubuque
15 June 1893ElevatedDiocese of Dubuque Archdiocese of Dubuque
15 January 1902Territory LostArchdiocese of Dubuque Diocese of Sioux City (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Dubuque
190822292310780165ce
1950147,412800,00018.4%35216368400861,983204ap1951
1966214,730914,34023.5%4451175623822442,015238ap1967
1970231,247914,34025.3%37717394586701,853ap1971*
1976243,458956,07825.5%372704425501771,551235ap1977
1980249,000982,00025.4%35476430579252261,446234ap1981
1990229,9451,058,10021.7%3033834167459831,299226ap1991
1999218,108923,00023.6%260362967366627998211ap2000
2000237,205923,00025.7%2253626190860130936212ap2001
2001219,195923,00023.7%2223625884959149889211ap2002
2002213,555927,16123.0%2153124686864138842209ap2003
2003212,619927,16122.9%2103724786066172831201ap2004
2004211,847927,16122.8%2103224287575158826199ap2005
2006216,000944,00022.9%2053323890775133818187ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 28 May 2013