Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Edwin Franklin

Bishop Emeritus of Davenport, Iowa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1930 BornParnell
4 Feb 195625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
29 Jan 198756.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
29 Jan 198756.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Surista
1 Apr 198756.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Surista
12 Nov 199363.5AppointedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
20 Jan 199463.7InstalledBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
12 Oct 200676.4RetiredBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for William Edwin Franklin:
Bishop William Edwin Franklin (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Davenport

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Davenport.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2006
  • i/dave: Website of the Diocese, 18 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013