Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel William Kucera, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1923Born
16 Jun 194421.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 May 194926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Jun 197754.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
6 Jun 197754.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Natchesium
21 Jul 197754.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Natchesium
5 Mar 198056.8AppointedBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
7 May 198057.0InstalledBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
20 Dec 198360.6AppointedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
23 Feb 198460.7InstalledArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
16 Oct 199572.4RetiredArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
30 May 201794.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel William Kucera (VIAF: 68553300)
Archbishop Daniel William Kucera O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Death PlaceStonehill Care Center, Dubuque, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 31 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jun 2017