Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Dwayne Gruss

Bishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1955 Born
2 Jul 199439.0Ordained PriestPriest of Davenport, Iowa, USA
26 May 201155.9AppointedBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
28 Jul 201156.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
24 May 201963.9AppointedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
26 Jul 201964.0InstalledBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Dwayne Gruss
Bishop Robert Dwayne Gruss (born ) Bishop of Saginaw

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTexarkana, AR, Diocese of Little Rock, Arkansas
Ordained BishopRushmore Plaza Civic Center, Rapid City, Diocese of Rapid City, South Dakota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saginaw.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,120
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2019
  • i: CB, 26 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 Jul 2019

Quantcast