Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Steven Robert Biegler

Bishop-Elect of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1959 Born
9 Jul 199334.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
16 Mar 201757.9AppointedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
5 Jun 201758.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA

MicroData Summary for Steven Robert Biegler
Father Steven Robert Biegler (born ) Bishop-Elect of Cheyenne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMobridge, Diocese of Rapid City, South Dakota
Ordained PriestTimber Lake, Diocese of Rapid City, South Dakota
Ordained BishopCivil Center, Cheyenne, Diocese of Cheyenne, Wyoming

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Cheyenne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 16 Mar 2017
  • mi/c1: CB, 30 Mar 2017
  • mn/c2: CB, 22 Apr 2017
  • c34: CB, 24 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Apr 2017