Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Joseph Chaput, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1944 BornConcordia, KS
14 Jul 196823.8Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Aug 197025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Apr 198843.5AppointedBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
26 Jul 198843.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
18 Mar 199752.5AppointedArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
7 Apr 199752.5InstalledArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
19 Jul 201166.8AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Sep 201167.0InstalledArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Joseph Chaput:
Archbishop Charles Joseph Chaput O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Philadelphia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,728
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Sep 2014