Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Thomas Persico

Bishop of Erie, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1950 BornMonessen, PA
8 Jun 197625.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
30 Apr 197726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
31 Jul 201261.7AppointedBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
1 Oct 201261.9Ordained BishopBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Thomas Persico:
Bishop Lawrence Thomas Persico (born ) Bishop of Erie

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Erie.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2012
  • od/ob/c1: Website of the Diocese, 31 Jul 2012
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,547

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013