Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Blase Joseph Cardinal Cupich

Archbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1949 Born
16 Aug 197526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
7 Jul 199849.3AppointedBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
21 Sep 199849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
30 Jun 201061.2AppointedBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
3 Sep 201061.4InstalledBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
20 Sep 201465.5AppointedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Nov 201465.6InstalledArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
19 Nov 201667.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201667.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
20 Nov 201667.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola

MicroData Summary for Blase Joseph Cupich (VIAF: 370153409793441581799)
Blase Joseph Cardinal Cupich (born ) Archbishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOmaha, NE, Archdiocese of Omaha, Nebraska
Ordained BishopRushmore Plaza Civic Center, Rapid City, Diocese of Rapid City, South Dakota

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010
  • ab/c1: CB, 2 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,434
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2014
  • i: CB, 20 Sep 2014
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast