Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Robert J. Lombardo, C.F.R.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Munatiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1957 Born
1980²22.3EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1986²28.3Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 May 199032.6Ordained PriestPriest of Franciscan Friars of the Renewal
11 Sep 202063.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Sep 202063.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
13 Nov 202063.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert J. Lombardo
Father Robert J. Lombardo C.F.R. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStamford, Diocese of Bridgeport, Connecticut
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Sep 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Sep 2020

Quantcast