Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Raymond Manz

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Mulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1945 BornChicago
12 May 197125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
23 Jan 199650.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
23 Jan 199650.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulia
5 Mar 199650.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulia

MicroData Summary for John Raymond Manz:
Bishop John Raymond Manz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,693
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015