Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeffrey Scott Grob

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Abora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1961 Born
23 May 199231.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Sep 202059.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Sep 202059.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Abora
13 Nov 202059.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abora

MicroData Summary for Jeffrey Scott Grob
Bishop Jeffrey Scott Grob (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadison, Diocese of Madison, Wisconsin
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Sep 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Sep 2020
  • mn: CB, 12 Sep 2020
  • c34: CB, 5 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast