Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Vincent Brennan

Bishop of Fresno, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1954 Born
21 Jun 198026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
21 Jul 201561.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
21 Jul 201561.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
8 Sep 201561.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
5 Mar 201964.9AppointedBishop of Fresno, California, USA
2 May 201965.1InstalledBishop of Fresno, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vincent Brennan
Bishop Joseph Vincent Brennan (born ) Bishop of Fresno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVan Nuys
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Angels, Cathedral, Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fresno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2015
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Jul 2015
  • c23: CB, 11 Aug 2015
  • c4: CB, 12 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,570
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2019
  • i: CB, 5 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 Mar 2019

Quantcast