Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Horacio Gómez Velasco

Archbishop of Los Angeles, California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1951 BornMonterrey, México
15 Aug 197826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
23 Jan 200149.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
23 Jan 200149.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Belali
26 Mar 200149.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belali
29 Dec 200453.0AppointedArchbishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
15 Feb 200553.1InstalledArchbishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
6 Apr 201058.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
1 Mar 201159.1SucceededArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for José Horacio Gómez Velasco:
Archbishop José Horacio Gómez Velasco (born ) Archbishop of Los Angeles

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2010
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,950

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 13 Aug 2015