Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Javier Echevarría Rodríguez

Deceased

Prelate of Opus Dei

Titular Bishop of Cilibia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1932Born
7 Aug 195523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
20 Apr 199461.8AppointedPrelate of Opus Dei
21 Nov 199462.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cilibia
6 Jan 199562.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cilibia
12 Dec 201684.4DiedPrelate of Opus Dei

MicroData Summary for Javier Echevarría Rodríguez (VIAF: 44352635)
Bishop Javier Echevarría Rodríguez (born , died ) Prelate of Opus Dei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,461
  • d: CB, 12 Dec 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast