Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jaume Pujol Balcells

Archbishop Emeritus of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1944 Born
5 Aug 197329.4Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
15 Jun 200460.3AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
19 Sep 200460.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
4 May 201975.2RetiredArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaume Pujol Balcells (VIAF: 33260079)
Archbishop Jaume Pujol Balcells (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuissona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tarragona, Archdiocese of Tarragona

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tarragona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,688
  • r: Bollettino, 4 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 4 May 2019

Quantcast