Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Pardo Artigas

Bishop of Girona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1946 Born
31 May 197326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
16 Jul 200862.0AppointedBishop of Girona, Spain
19 Oct 200862.3Ordained BishopBishop of Girona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pardo Artigas
Bishop Francisco Pardo Artigas (born ) Bishop of Girona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorrellas de Foix

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Girona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,981

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018