Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joan Planellas i Barnosell

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1955 Born
28 Mar 198226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gerona, Spain
4 May 201963.4AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
8 Jun 201963.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joan Planellas i Barnosell (VIAF: 69249724)
Archbishop Joan Planellas i Barnosell (born ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGirona, Diocese of Gerona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tarragona, Archdiocese of Tarragona

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tarragona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2019
  • ob: CB, 4 May 2019
  • c2+: CB, 8 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Jun 2019

Quantcast