Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabino Díaz Merchán

Archbishop Emeritus of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1926 BornMora
13 Jul 195226.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 196539.4AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
22 Aug 196539.4Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
4 Aug 196943.4AppointedArchbishop of Oviedo, Spain
7 Jan 200275.8RetiredArchbishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gabino Díaz Merchán:
Archbishop Gabino Díaz Merchán (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Oviedo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Oviedo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 21 May 2015