Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pablo Puente Buces

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Macri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1931 BornColindres, Spain
2 Apr 195624.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 198048.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Macri
18 Mar 198048.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Indonesia
25 May 198048.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Macri
15 Mar 198654.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cape Verde
15 Mar 198654.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sénégal
15 Mar 198654.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Guinea-Bissau
15 Mar 198654.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mauritania
12 May 198654.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Mali
29 May 198756.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau
31 Jul 198958.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
25 May 199361.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kuwait
31 Jul 199766.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain
23 Oct 200473.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Puente Buces:
Archbishop Pablo Puente Buces (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Great Britain

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Great Britain.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013