Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Delegation to Indonesia | |||
7 July 1947 | Established | Delegation to Indonesia | |
Nunciature to Indonesia | |||
15 March 1950 | Elevated | Delegation to Indonesia | Nunciature to Indonesia (as Internunciature) |
7 December 1965 | Elevated | Nunciature to Indonesia (to Nunciature) |
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 8 Aug 2023 |
✠