Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Mees

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Southern Africa

Titular Archbishop of Ypres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1923BornBornem, Belgium
4 Apr 194824.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 196946.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ypres
14 Jun 196946.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Indonesia
30 Jun 196946.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ypres
10 Jul 197350.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
19 Jan 198561.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Southern Africa
19 Jan 198561.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Lesotho
Oct 198764.4ResignedApostolic Delegate to Southern Africa
Oct 198764.4ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Lesotho
9 Dec 200178.6DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Southern Africa

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mees
Archbishop Joseph Mees (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Southern Africa

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016