Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Milcíades Villalba Aquino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1924Born
28 Nov 194824.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 197853.9AppointedBishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay
3 Sep 197854.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay
22 Jul 199974.9RetiredBishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay
8 Jan 201691.3DiedBishop Emeritus of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Carlos Milcíades Villalba Aquino
Bishop Carlos Milcíades Villalba Aquino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro de Ycuámandyjú

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 9 Jan 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Feb 2017