Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay

Dioecesis Sanctissimae Concepionis in Paraguay



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 16 July 1949
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Asunción
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Paraguay
  • Square Kilometers: 30,984 (11,967 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Nuestra Senora de la Concepcion y Mariscal Estigarribia, Concepcion, Paraguay
  • Telephone: (031)42-357
  • Fax: 42-827

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Concepción y Chaco
1 May 1929ErectedDiocese of Paraguay
Prefecture Apostolic of Pilcomayo
Diocese of Concepción y Chaco (erected)
11 March 1948Territory LostDiocese of Concepción y Chaco Vicariate Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo (erected)
Diocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
16 July 1949Name ChangedDiocese of Concepción y Chaco Diocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
21 January 1957Territory LostDiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
Diocese of Villarrica
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación y Alto Paraná (erected)
2 August 1960Territory LostArchdiocese of Asunción
Diocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
Territorial Prelature of Caacupé (erected)
10 September 1961Territory LostDiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay Territorial Prelature of Coronel Oviedo (erected)
5 June 1978Territory LostDiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay Diocese of San Pedro (erected)
28 June 1980Territory LostDiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
Vicariate Apostolic of Pilcomayo
Diocese of Benjamín Aceval (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
1949240,000250,00096.0%1618347,058184826ap1951
1966211,000212,00099.5%1719365,861243929ap1967
1970259,300259,50099.9%1418328,103284919ap1971
1976306,000340,49089.9%1618349,000276220ap1977
1980201,800205,50098.2%1314277,474255411ap1981
1990272,000276,00098.6%10152510,8801812ap1991
1999305,000309,00098.7%15122711,296207214ap2000
2000312,000316,00098.7%1814329,750226514ap2001
2001300,600302,41399.4%2012329,393176214ap2002
2002300,600302,41399.4%2011319,696176014ap2003
2003300,600302,41399.4%2012329,393176014ap2004
2004347,902350,00099.4%19133210,871195814ap2005
2006362,000367,00098.6%20133310,969185915ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 14 Sep 2013