Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Gavilán Velásquez

Bishop of Coronel Oviedo, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1951 Born
18 Dec 197726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Caacupé, Paraguay
5 Mar 199442.6AppointedBishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
8 May 199442.8Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
18 Dec 200150.4AppointedBishop of Coronel Oviedo, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Gavilán Velásquez
Bishop Juan Bautista Gavilán Velásquez (born ) Bishop of Coronel Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEusebio Ayala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Coronel Oviedo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,316

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018