Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Demetrio Ignacio Aquino Aquino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caacupé, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1926Born
13 Dec 195326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Caacupé, Paraguay
12 Jun 197144.4AppointedBishop of Caacupé, Paraguay
1 Aug 197144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caacupé, Paraguay
1 Nov 199467.8ResignedBishop of Caacupé, Paraguay
11 Aug 200376.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Caacupé, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Demetrio Ignacio Aquino Aquino
Bishop Demetrio Ignacio Aquino Aquino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caacupé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaraguatay
Ordained BishopCaacupé, Diocese of Caacupé

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast