Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo

Dioecesis Villaricensis Spiritus Sancti



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 13 January 1990
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Asunción
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Paraguay
  • Square Kilometers: 13,347 (5,155 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Natalicio Talavera 720, Villarrica, Paraguay
  • Telephone: (0541)42.687
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Villarrica
1 May 1929ErectedDiocese of Paraguay Diocese of Villarrica (erected)
19 January 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Asunción
Diocese of Villarrica
Diocese of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones (erected)
21 January 1957Territory LostDiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
Diocese of Villarrica
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación y Alto Paraná (erected)
5 June 1978Territory LostDiocese of Villarrica Diocese of Carapeguá (erected)
Diocese of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo
13 January 1990Name ChangedDiocese of Villarrica Diocese of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Villarrica
1950600,000620,00096.8%31205111,7641237104ap1951
1966379,000380,00099.7%5418725,263185434ap1967
1970420,000.0%5117680216536ap1971
1976373,920393,62595.0%4017576,560173841ap1977
1980244,000257,00094.9%2413376,594135531ap1981
Diocese of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo
1990397,000414,00095.9%2913429,45228137532ap1991
1999285,516291,34398.0%4212545,287451211333ap2000
2000290,000296,00098.0%4710575,087451911333ap2001
2001289,000295,46597.8%5112634,587452011333ap2002
2002289,000295,46597.8%4515604,816492111333ap2003
2003289,000292,34798.9%4115565,160492111333ap2004
2004290,140293,50098.9%4015555,275502211333ap2005
2010316,000321,00098.4%388466,86954174131ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 9 Aug 2012