Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bartolomé Adorno

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Villarrica, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1896Born
30 Apr 193134.6AppointedBishop of Villarrica, Paraguay
Sep 1931²35.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Villarrica, Paraguay
10 Sep 197579.0DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Villarrica, Paraguay

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Adorno
Father Bartolomé Adorno (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Villarrica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMbuyapey
Death PlaceAsunción, Archdiocese of Asunción

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1931

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast