Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Jorge Valenzuela Rios

Bishop of Caacupé, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1954 Born
12 Dec 198227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Asunción, Paraguay
27 Nov 199338.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Asunción, Paraguay
27 Nov 199338.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Calanae
6 Jan 199439.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Calanae
24 May 200348.4AppointedBishop of Paraguay, Military
25 Jun 201055.5AppointedBishop of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo, Paraguay
22 Aug 201055.6InstalledBishop of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo, Paraguay
25 Sep 201459.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay
21 Dec 201460.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay
29 Jun 201762.5AppointedBishop of Caacupé, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Jorge Valenzuela Rios
Bishop Ricardo Jorge Valenzuela Rios (born ) Bishop of Caacupé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsunción, Archdiocese of Asunción

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caacupé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,195
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Sep 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jun 2017