Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ciudad del Este

Dioecesis Urbis Orientalis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 3 February 2001
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Asunción
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Paraguay
  • Square Kilometers: 29,562 (11,418 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://diocesiscde.info/
  • Mailing Address: Casilla Pampliega 415 y Mons. Cedzich, Ciudad del Este, Alto Parana, Paraguay
  • Telephone: (061)512.318
  • Fax: 511.390

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Alto Paraná
25 March 1968SplitTerritorial Prelature of Encarnación y Alto Paraná Territorial Prelature of Alto Paraná
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación
Diocese of Alto Paraná
10 July 1993ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Alto Paraná Diocese of Alto Paraná
Diocese of Ciudad del Este
3 February 2001Name ChangedDiocese of Alto Paraná Diocese of Ciudad del Este

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Alto Paraná
197065,00070,00092.9%11115,90911167ap1971
1976130,000150,00086.7%122235,65227209ap1977
1980184,600236,00078.2%234365,127444721ap1981
1990494,000514,80096.0%152539,3201589630ap1991
Diocese of Alto Paraná
1999567,000586,00096.8%957668,5906612031ap2000
Diocese of Ciudad del Este
2000580,000600,00096.7%1157688,5296612031ap2001
2001580,000600,00096.7%1556718,1695612034ap2002
2002585,000605,00096.7%1466807,3126611035ap2003
2003590,000600,00098.3%1566817,2836612035ap2004
2004590,000600,10098.3%1470847,02310012236ap2005
2006700,000712,20998.3%1270828,5368212538ap2007
2013783,000795,00098.5%62491117,05417412447ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.4, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 22 Dec 2014