Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Gogorza Izaguirre, S.C.I. di Béth.

Bishop Emeritus of Encarnación


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1936 BornAzcoitia, Spain
1955²18.4ProfessedMember of Priests of the Sacred Heart of Jesus of Bétharram
29 Jun 196124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Priests of the Sacred Heart of Jesus of Bétharram
26 Mar 199861.6AppointedBishop of Coronel Oviedo, Paraguay
7 Jun 199861.8Ordained BishopBishop of Coronel Oviedo, Paraguay
3 Feb 200164.5AppointedBishop of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay
12 Jul 200467.9AppointedBishop of Encarnación, Paraguay
12 Sep 200468.1InstalledBishop of Encarnación, Paraguay
15 Nov 201478.2RetiredBishop of Encarnación, Paraguay

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Gogorza Izaguirre:
Bishop Ignacio Gogorza Izaguirre S.C.I. di Béth. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Encarnación

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Encarnación.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,336
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015