Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Silvero Acosta, S.C.I. di Béth.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Encarnación, Paraguay

Titular Bishop of Curubis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1935 Born
16 Dec 196227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Priests of the Sacred Heart of Jesus of Bétharram
15 Mar 197640.3AppointedBishop of Coronel Oviedo, Paraguay
1 May 197640.5Ordained BishopBishop of Coronel Oviedo, Paraguay
26 Mar 199862.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Encarnación, Paraguay
26 Mar 199862.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Curubis
15 Nov 201479.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Encarnación, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Claudio Silvero Acosta
Bishop Claudio Silvero Acosta S.C.I. di Béth. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Encarnación

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIturbe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Encarnación.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018