Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ismael Blas Rolón Silvero, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Asunción


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1914BornCaazapá
23 Nov 194127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Aug 196046.5AppointedPrelate of Caacupé, Paraguay
20 Oct 196551.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
23 Jan 196652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
29 Mar 196753.2AppointedBishop of Caacupé, Paraguay
16 Jun 197056.4AppointedArchbishop of Asunción, Paraguay
20 May 198975.3RetiredArchbishop of Asunción, Paraguay
8 Jun 201096.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Asunción, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Ismael Blas Rolón Silvero:
Archbishop Ismael Blas Rolón Silvero S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Asunción

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 15 Nov 2014