Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zacarías Ortiz Rolón, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1934Born
14 Jan 196126.3ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Aug 196530.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
12 Mar 198853.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay
12 Mar 198853.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Minora
26 Jun 198853.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Minora
12 Jul 200368.8AppointedBishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
11 Jul 201378.8RetiredBishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
6 Jan 202085.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Zacarías Ortiz Rolón
Bishop Zacarías Ortiz Rolón S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArroyos y Esteros
Ordained BishopAsunción, Archdiocese of Asunción
Death PlaceCentral del Instituto de Previsión Social, Hospital, Asunción, Archdiocese of Asunción

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,561
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2013
  • d: CB, 6 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast