Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Narciso Escobar Ayala, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo

Titular Bishop of Media


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1971 BornAsunción
31 Jan 199321.6ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 Jan 199927.6Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 Feb 200129.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Jun 201342.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay
18 Jun 201342.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Media
3 Aug 201342.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Media
9 Aug 201342.1InstalledVicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Narciso Escobar Ayala:
Bishop Gabriel Narciso Escobar Ayala S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 8 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 2 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013